SD HB1213 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 623
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 623
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a reduced amount of state aid to education funding to certain school districts with a fall enrollment of less than one hundred.
Title
Provide a reduced amount of state aid to education funding to certain school districts with a fall enrollment of less than one hundred.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Education Deferred to another day (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Education Deferred to another day (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | Senate | Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 623 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 435 |
2013-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 11. H.J. 412 |
2013-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 412 Amendment 1213ca |
2013-02-13 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 6. H.J. 365 |
2013-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-06 | House | Education Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 4. |
2013-02-06 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1213ca |
2013-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 209 |