SD HB1217 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 35-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 741
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 35-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 741
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish certain legislative findings pertaining to the decision of a pregnant mother considering termination of her relationship with her child by an abortion, to establish certain procedures to better insure that such decisions are voluntary, uncoerced, and informed, and to revise certain causes of action for professional negligence relating to performance of an abortion.
Title
Establish certain legislative findings pertaining to the decision of a pregnant mother considering termination of her relationship with her child by an abortion, to establish certain procedures to better insure that such decisions are voluntary, uncoerced, and informed, and to revise certain causes of action for professional negligence relating to performance of an abortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 49 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 49 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor H.J. 741 | |
2011-03-08 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 688 | |
2011-03-07 | Signed by President S.J. 640 | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 621 | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 21, NAYS 13. S.J. 598 | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 573 | |
2011-02-28 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 548 | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 501 | |
2011-02-22 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 19. H.J. 476 | |
2011-02-22 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 475 Amendment 1217rd | |
2011-02-17 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 454 | |
2011-02-16 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 433 | |
2011-02-14 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 370 | |
2011-02-14 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1217ra | |
2011-02-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 219 |