SD HB1223 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-3)
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-3)
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt from sales tax certain handling fees paid by religious organizations to approved relief agencies for the distribution of food which is provided for the assistance or relief of the poor, distressed, or underprivileged through food giveaway programs.
Title
Exempt from sales tax certain handling fees paid by religious organizations to approved relief agencies for the distribution of food which is provided for the assistance or relief of the poor, distressed, or underprivileged through food giveaway programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | Signed by Governor H.J. 594 | |
2012-02-22 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by President S.J. 491 | |
2012-02-16 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 513 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 456 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 405 | |
2012-02-13 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 380 | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-07 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 299 | |
2012-02-06 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 320 | |
2012-02-02 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 293 | |
2012-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 196 |