SD HB1226 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Accommodate legislation for education.
Title
Accommodate legislation for education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House State Affairs Tabled (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 478 |
2015-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-20 | House | Deferred by Chair, Passed |
2015-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to House State Affairs, Passed H.J. 341 |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to House Education H.J. 285 |
2015-02-03 | House | First read in House H.J. 265 |