SD HB1228 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 25. S.J. 469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 25. S.J. 469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expand the ability for patients to seek investigational drugs, biological products, or devices.
Title
Expand the ability for patients to seek investigational drugs, biological products, or devices.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Haugaard [R] | Rep. Aaron Aylward [R] | Rep. Taffy Howard [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] |
Rep. Tina Mulally [R] | Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Rep. Tony Randolph [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 25. S.J. 469 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 2. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 329 |
2022-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 13. H.J. 441 |
2022-02-22 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 1. |
2022-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 156 |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 139 |