SD HB1229 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 567
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 567
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the requirement for a school district with an enrollment of one hundred or fewer students to reorganize.
Title
Repeal the requirement for a school district with an enrollment of one hundred or fewer students to reorganize.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 567 | |
2011-03-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 501 | |
2011-02-22 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 12. H.J. 473 | |
2011-02-17 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 454 | |
2011-02-16 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 410 | |
2011-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 222 |