SD HB1232 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the pay of certain constitutional officers.
Title
Increase the pay of certain constitutional officers.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570 |
2021-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 445 |
2021-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 488 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 378 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 350 |
2021-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 17. H.J. 385 |
2021-02-22 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. |
2021-02-22 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1232B |
2021-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 212 |
2021-02-03 | House | First Reading House H.J. 190 |