SD HB1239 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Senate Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 8. S.J. 730
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Senate Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 8. S.J. 730
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate money to the Board of Regents for the purpose of funding increased employee health insurance costs, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Appropriate money to the Board of Regents for the purpose of funding increased employee health insurance costs, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Conference Committee report not adopted (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 8. S.J. 730 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 721 Amendment cc1239A |
2013-03-07 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 5. H.J. 805 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 795 Amendment Cc1239A |
2013-03-06 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 773 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 770 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 702 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 684 Amendment 1239mta |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 5. S.J. 684 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 683 Amendment 1239ma |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 655 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 630 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 600 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 576 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 561 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 544 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 538 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 481 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-07 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 360 |
2013-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 330 Amendment 1239jta |
2013-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 17. H.J. 330 |
2013-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 329 Amendment 1239ja |
2013-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 8. H.J. 324 |
2013-02-05 | House | Intent to reconsider H.J. 313 |
2013-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 33, NAYS 36. H.J. 313 |
2013-01-31 | House | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 266 |
2013-01-31 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1239tb |
2013-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 214 |