SD HB1242 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the use of tribal identification cards as the equivalent of certain state-issued documents for identification purposes.
Title
Authorize the use of tribal identification cards as the equivalent of certain state-issued documents for identification purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor H.J. 740 | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 688 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 706 | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 649 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 640 | |
2011-03-03 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 608 | |
2011-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 523 | |
2011-02-23 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 502 | |
2011-02-17 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 442 | |
2011-02-17 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1242ra | |
2011-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 225 |