SD HB1245 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the suspension of a driver license for certain alcoholic beverage violations.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the suspension of a driver license for certain alcoholic beverage violations.
Sponsors
Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] | Rep. Jon Hansen [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Lance Russell [R] |
Rep. Burt Tulson [R] | Rep. Mark Venner [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor H.J. 720 | |
2012-02-27 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 639 | |
2012-02-24 | Signed by President S.J. 563 | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 588 | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 506 | |
2012-02-21 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-21 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 479 | |
2012-02-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-09 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 338 | |
2012-02-08 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 361 | |
2012-02-06 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 311 | |
2012-02-06 | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1245sa | |
2012-02-06 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 217 |