SD HB1245 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - Commerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 464
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - Commerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 464
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Accommodate legislation relating to occupational licensing.
Title
Accommodate legislation relating to occupational licensing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-19 - House - House Commerce and Energy Tabled (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Commerce and Energy Tabled, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 464 |
2016-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-17 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 322 |
2016-02-04 | House | First Reading House H.J. 290 |