SD HB1265 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor H.J. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor H.J. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions related to indigent counsel.
Title
Revise certain provisions related to indigent counsel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor H.J. 860 | |
2010-03-12 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 855 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by President S.J. 677 | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 847 | |
2010-03-10 | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 814 | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 613 | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-03-04 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 565 | |
2010-03-04 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1265ra | |
2010-03-04 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-25 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-19 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 389 | |
2010-02-18 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 466 | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-17 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 445 | |
2010-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-03 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 290 |