SD HB1270 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 40. H.J. 345
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 40. H.J. 345
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Require a defendant in a criminal proceeding to be physically present during the reading of victim impact statements.
Title
Require a defendant in a criminal proceeding to be physically present during the reading of victim impact statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - House - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 40. H.J. 345 |
2022-02-15 | House | Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 326 |
2022-02-09 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed H.J. 1 |
2022-02-09 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-09 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 1270A |
2022-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 155 |