SD HCR1002 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 85-19)
Status: Enrolled on February 2 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 174
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 2 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 174
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the selection of the F-35 Joint Strike Fighter beddown at Joe Foss Field, 114th Fighter Wing, South Dakota Air National Guard.
Title
Supporting the selection of the F-35 Joint Strike Fighter beddown at Joe Foss Field, 114th Fighter Wing, South Dakota Air National Guard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 174 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 162 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 194 |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 178 |