SD HCR1003 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Enrolled on February 2 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 6. S.J. 174
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 2 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 6. S.J. 174
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging recognition of the current gender wage gap and calling for the enforcement of equal pay for equal work laws.
Title
Encouraging recognition of the current gender wage gap and calling for the enforcement of equal pay for equal work laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 6. S.J. 174 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 162 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 195 |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 179 |