SD HCR1003 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 26 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 215
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 26 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 215
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging school districts to provide for an annual academic scholarship signing day in schools.
Title
Encouraging school districts to provide for an annual academic scholarship signing day in schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Jenna Netherton [R] | Rep. Taffy Howard [R] | Rep. Jason Kettwig [R] | Sen. Jenna Netherton [R] |
Sen. Joshua Klumb [R] | Sen. Jack Kolbeck [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-26 | House | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 215 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced S.J. 198 |
2017-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 174 |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduced H.J. 160 |