SD HCR1004 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 1 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 1 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the heartfelt condolences of South Dakotans to the people of Haiti for their losses resulting from the devastating and horrific earthquake of January 12, 2010, and also to urge the people of South Dakota to be charitable in this time of great human suffering.
Title
Expressing the heartfelt condolences of South Dakotans to the people of Haiti for their losses resulting from the devastating and horrific earthquake of January 12, 2010, and also to urge the people of South Dakota to be charitable in this time of great human suffering.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 180 | |
2010-01-27 | Introduced S.J. 146 | |
2010-01-26 | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 173 | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced H.J. 168 |