SD HCR1005 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 10. S.J. 365
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Petitioning Congress and the President to defend Israel against hostile actions; expressing the strongest support for, and unity with, the people and State of Israel; and strongly condemning the Boycott, Divestment, and Sanctions movement and the increasing incidents of anti-Semitism against Israel and the Jewish people.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Petitioning Congress and the President to defend Israel against hostile actions; expressing the strongest support for, and unity with, the people and State of Israel; and strongly condemning the Boycott, Divestment, and Sanctions movement and the increasing incidents of anti-Semitism against Israel and the Jewish people.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseSenate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 10. S.J. 365
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced S.J. 349
2019-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 11. H.J. 354
2019-02-08HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 341
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced H.J. 324

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback