SD HCR1007 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 84-5)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 547
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 547
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Opposing the EPA's guidelines to reduce carbon dioxide emissions from existing fossil fuel-fired power plants in a manner that will cause economic harm.
Title
Opposing the EPA's guidelines to reduce carbon dioxide emissions from existing fossil fuel-fired power plants in a manner that will cause economic harm.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 547 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 527 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 9. H.J. 511 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 492 |