SD HCR1012 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 16 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 305
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 16 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 305
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting the South Dakota congressional delegation to introduce legislation to compensate private landowners for fire damage caused by the United States Forest Service.
Title
Requesting the South Dakota congressional delegation to introduce legislation to compensate private landowners for fire damage caused by the United States Forest Service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 305 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 292 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 358 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 343 |