SD HCR1013 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 58-19)
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 620
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 620
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the positive economic impact sportsmen and sportswomen have in South Dakota.
Title
Recognizing the positive economic impact sportsmen and sportswomen have in South Dakota.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-22 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 620 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 336 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 336 Amendment c1013xa |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 321 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 395 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 379 |