SD HCR6007 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-5)
Status: Enrolled on February 15 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 343
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 15 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 343
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging the United States Department of Veteran Affairs to allow veterans to receive long-term care services at facilities that do not otherwise meet the requirements set by the department.
Title
Encouraging the United States Department of Veteran Affairs to allow veterans to receive long-term care services at facilities that do not otherwise meet the requirements set by the department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 343 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee assignment waived S.J. 325 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 310 |
2024-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 305 |
2024-02-06 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-06 | House | Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-06 | House | Military and Veterans Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment HCR6007A |
2024-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-18 | House | First read in House and referred to House Military and Veterans Affairs H.J. 82 |