SD HJR5003 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Delivered to the Secretary of State H.J. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Delivered to the Secretary of State H.J. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing and submitting to the voters at the next primary election a new section to Article XI of the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, relating to a three-fifths vote requirement for certain initiated or Legislature-proposed constitutional amendments and initiated or Legislature-referred measures.
Title
Proposing and submitting to the voters at the next primary election a new section to Article XI of the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, relating to a three-fifths vote requirement for certain initiated or Legislature-proposed constitutional amendments and initiated or Legislature-referred measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - House of Representatives: Concurred in amendments (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House of Representatives: Motion to amend (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House of Representatives: Motion to amend (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Secretary of State H.J. 530 |
2021-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 527 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 450 |
2021-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 17. H.J. 493 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 17. S.J. 379 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend resolution, Passed S.J. 378 Amendment HJR5003C |
2021-03-01 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 278 |
2021-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 12. H.J. 297 |
2021-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 296 Amendment HJR5003B |
2021-02-10 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. |
2021-02-10 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment HJR5003A |
2021-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 179 |