SD SB100 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Veto override, Failed, YEAS 43, NAYS 22. H.J. 884
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Veto override, Failed, YEAS 43, NAYS 22. H.J. 884
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enhance South Dakota economic development through broadband infrastructure improvements.
Title
Enhance South Dakota economic development through broadband infrastructure improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - House - House Veto override (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Veto override (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Veto override (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Veto override, Failed, YEAS 43, NAYS 22. H.J. 884 |
2016-03-29 | House | Veto override, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 626 |
2016-03-29 | House | Vetoed by the Governor S.J. 622 |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 603 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 861 |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-09 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 583 |
2016-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 5. H.J. 803 |
2016-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 802 Amendment 100jb |
2016-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 781 |
2016-03-02 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 749 |
2016-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 699 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 433 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | State Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 100ja |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 149 |