SD SB110 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Signed by Governor S.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Signed by Governor S.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the posting of a bond by parolees under certain circumstances.
Title
Provide for the posting of a bond by parolees under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Signed by Governor S.J. 626 | |
2010-03-08 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 585 | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 711 | |
2010-03-03 | Signed by President S.J. 558 | |
2010-03-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 1. H.J. 650 | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-03-01 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 627 | |
2010-03-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-04 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 317 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 5. S.J. 237 | |
2010-02-02 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 204 | |
2010-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-27 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 148 |