SD SB112 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Senate Failed to concur, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 0. S.J. 475
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Senate Failed to concur, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 0. S.J. 475
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reduce certain gross receipts tax rates and a use tax rate, and to repeal a conditional reduction of certain gross receipts tax rates.
Title
Reduce certain gross receipts tax rates and a use tax rate, and to repeal a conditional reduction of certain gross receipts tax rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Failed to concur, no committee appointed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Failed to concur, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 0. S.J. 475 |
2023-02-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 6. H.J. 415 |
2023-02-28 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 412 Amendment 112A |
2023-02-27 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 7 |
2023-02-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 348 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 308 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 292 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2023-02-15 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 114 |