SD SB117 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 563
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize Spanish to be used in the process of issuing certain driver licenses and permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize Spanish to be used in the process of issuing certain driver licenses and permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseState Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 563
2019-02-27HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 8.
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-22HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 484
2019-02-21SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 15. S.J. 460
2019-02-11SenateFiscal Note Requested, Passed S.J. 334
2019-02-11SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 334
2019-02-08SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 320
2019-02-06SenateTransportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1.
2019-02-06SenateTransportation Title amended, Passed S.J. 275 Amendment 117jta
2019-02-06SenateTransportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 117kb
2019-02-06SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 185

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback