SD SB124 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 6. H.J. 791
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 6. H.J. 791
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establish the per student allocation for FY 2011, and to revise the index factor in the state aid to education formula.
Title
Establish the per student allocation for FY 2011, and to revise the index factor in the state aid to education formula.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Education Hoghoused (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Education Hoghoused (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 6. H.J. 791 | |
2010-03-08 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 754 | |
2010-03-04 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 709 | |
2010-03-03 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 687 | |
2010-03-01 | Education Title amended, Passed Amendment 124ctb | |
2010-03-01 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 5. H.J. 623 | |
2010-03-01 | Education Hoghoused, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 6. Amendment 124cf | |
2010-03-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-12 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 383 | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 308 | |
2010-02-09 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 255 | |
2010-02-09 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 124cb | |
2010-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-04 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-04 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 164 |