SD SB124 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the requirements for a petition for a minor boundary change.
Title
Revise the requirements for a petition for a minor boundary change.
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Peters [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] | Sen. Timothy Rave [R] | Sen. Herman Otten [R] |
Rep. Paula Hawks [D] | Rep. Jacqueline Sly [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Education Motion to amend (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Education Motion to amend (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 714 |
2015-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 632 |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 644 |
2015-03-05 | House | Signed by President S.J. 613 |
2015-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 590 |
2015-03-03 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-03-03 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 563 |
2015-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-18 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 430 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 418 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 387 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Education Reconsidered, Passed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Education Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 2. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Education Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 3, NAYS 2. Amendment 124cc |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education, Passed S.J. 338 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 296 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 211 |