SD SB126 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on February 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-27 - Signed by Governor S.J. 592
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on February 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-27 - Signed by Governor S.J. 592
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the provisions that authorize townships to combine the offices of the clerk and the treasurer.
Title
Revise the provisions that authorize townships to combine the offices of the clerk and the treasurer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 592 |
2013-02-20 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 480 |
2013-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 445 |
2013-02-14 | House | Signed by President S.J. 420 |
2013-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 370 |
2013-02-12 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-12 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 351 |
2013-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-04 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 283 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 292 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 275 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 167 |