SD SB126 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 33. S.J. 309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 33. S.J. 309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require closure of litigation over the recreational use of nonmeandered waters.
Title
Require closure of litigation over the recreational use of nonmeandered waters.
Sponsors
Sen. Herman Otten [R] | Sen. Tom Pischke [R] | Rep. Hugh Bartels [R] | Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R] |
Rep. Ernie Otten [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 33. S.J. 309 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 293 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 130 |