SD SB133 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions related to distribution of funds to sparse school districts.
Title
Revise certain provisions related to distribution of funds to sparse school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 37 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Removed from table (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Tabled (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 37 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Removed from table (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Tabled (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-11 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 692 | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by President S.J. 677 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 6. S.J. 668 | |
2011-03-07 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 37, NAYS 33. H.J. 649 | |
2011-03-02 | Appropriations Title amended, Passed Amendment 133ota | |
2011-03-02 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 593 | |
2011-03-02 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 133oa | |
2011-03-02 | Appropriations Removed from table, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. | |
2011-02-28 | Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 543 | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-24 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 513 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 9. S.J. 505 | |
2011-02-22 | Education Title amended, Passed Amendment 133cta | |
2011-02-22 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 476 | |
2011-02-22 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 133ca | |
2011-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-17 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 198 |