SD SB133 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a pharmacy audit integrity program.
Title
Establish a pharmacy audit integrity program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 738 |
2013-03-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 634 |
2013-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-27 | House | Signed by President S.J. 615 |
2013-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 5. H.J. 558 |
2013-02-25 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 512 |
2013-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-22 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2013-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-07 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 340 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 346 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 304 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 133fa |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 168 |