SD SB140 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expand Medicaid eligibility for pregnant women and to make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Expand Medicaid eligibility for pregnant women and to make an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanford Adelstein [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Sen. Bernie Hunhoff [D] | Rep. Julie Bartling [D] |
Rep. Melissa Magstadt [R] | Rep. Ray Ring [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Appropriations Tabled (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | Senate | Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 477 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 170 |