SD SB141 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 5. H.J. 730
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 5. H.J. 730
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to fund certain scholarship programs and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to fund certain scholarship programs and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 5. H.J. 730 |
2014-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 690 |
2014-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 671 |
2014-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 659 |
2014-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 637 |
2014-03-03 | House | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 598 |
2014-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 575 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 467 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 141ata |
2014-02-21 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 401 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 141aa |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 184 |