SD SB143 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a civil remedy for a bad faith assertion of patent infringement.
Title
Provide for a civil remedy for a bad faith assertion of patent infringement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 688 |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 773 |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 670 |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by President S.J. 653 |
2014-03-12 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 641 |
2014-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 714 |
2014-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 713 Amendment 143oa |
2014-03-10 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 690 |
2014-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-03-05 | House | Deferred by Chair, Passed |
2014-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-18 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 430 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 334 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 334 Amendment 143rc |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 283 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 143rb |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 184 |