SD SB15 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the voting requirements necessary for the board to grant or deny parole or recommend clemency.
Title
Revise the voting requirements necessary for the board to grant or deny parole or recommend clemency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 232 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 05, 2021 S.J. 199 |
2021-02-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 218 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 174 |
2021-02-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 180 |
2021-02-01 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-02-01 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 130 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 104 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 96 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 2 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 2 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 15 |