SD SB154 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain statutes pertaining to persons required to report child abuse and neglect.
Title
Revise certain statutes pertaining to persons required to report child abuse and neglect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor S.J. 654 | |
2012-02-27 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 572 | |
2012-02-24 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 615 | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by President S.J. 548 | |
2012-02-22 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 554 | |
2012-02-21 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 518 | |
2012-02-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-10 | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 414 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 345 | |
2012-02-08 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 310 | |
2012-02-08 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 172 |