SD SB163 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Intent to reconsider S.J. 462
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Intent to reconsider S.J. 462
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding disclosure of contributors for independent campaign expenditures.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding disclosure of contributors for independent campaign expenditures.
Sponsors
Sen. Lance Russell [R] | Sen. Stace Nelson [R] | Rep. Drew Dennert [R] | Rep. Sue Lucas-Peterson [R] |
Rep. Lee Qualm [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 16 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Senate | Intent to reconsider S.J. 462 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 16. S.J. 462 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 459 Amendment 163wa |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 413 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 395 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 253 |