SD SB171 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2022 S.J. 462
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2022 S.J. 462
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit insurance policies from restricting the method of payment for dental care.
Title
Prohibit insurance policies from restricting the method of payment for dental care.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Miskimins [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Sen. Casey Crabtree [R] | Rep. Fred Deutsch [R] |
Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2022 S.J. 462 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 28, 2022 S.J. 404 |
2022-02-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 483 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 386 |
2022-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 1. H.J. 368 |
2022-02-16 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2022-02-16 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-14 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 282 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 234 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 1 Amendment 171C |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 139 |