SD SB188 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 659
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 659
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the establishment, operation, and control of research parks on lands controlled by the Board of Regents.
Title
Authorize the establishment, operation, and control of research parks on lands controlled by the Board of Regents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor S.J. 659 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 624 | |
2012-02-28 | Signed by President S.J. 605 | |
2012-02-27 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 636 | |
2012-02-24 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 595 | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 486 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 4. S.J. 428 | |
2012-02-13 | State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 188rta | |
2012-02-13 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 380 | |
2012-02-13 | State Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 188ra | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 193 |