SD SB19 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Signed by Governor S.J. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Signed by Governor S.J. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the rule-making authority of the Commission on Gaming to allow the commission to authorize the executive secretary of the Commission on Gaming to take certain actions on gaming licensees.
Title
Revise the rule-making authority of the Commission on Gaming to allow the commission to authorize the executive secretary of the Commission on Gaming to take certain actions on gaming licensees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Signed by Governor S.J. 640 | |
2012-02-23 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 533 | |
2012-02-22 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by President S.J. 491 | |
2012-02-16 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 506 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-15 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 480 | |
2012-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-24 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 178 | |
2012-01-23 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 144 | |
2012-01-20 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 93 | |
2012-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 16 |