SD SB200 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-4)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-4)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning campaign finance.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning campaign finance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 757 |
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 838 |
2013-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 754 |
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by President S.J. 745 |
2013-03-07 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 727 |
2013-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 8. H.J. 727 |
2013-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 727 Amendment 200oc |
2013-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 726 Amendment 200jb |
2013-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 650 |
2013-02-27 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 565 |
2013-02-27 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 200oa |
2013-02-27 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 200fa |
2013-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-25 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2013-02-06 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 326 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 332 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 316 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 223 |