SD SB205 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the hunting of wolves in certain circumstances.
Title
Authorize the hunting of wolves in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Vehle [R] | Sen. Tim Begalka [R] | Sen. Jim Bradford [D] | Sen. Corey Brown [R] |
Sen. Larry Lucas [D] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. David Omdahl [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] |
Sen. Bruce Rampelberg [R] | Sen. Timothy Rave [R] | Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] | Sen. Deb Soholt [R] |
Sen. Billie Sutton [D] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Rep. Lance Carson [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] |
Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] | Rep. Elizabeth May [R] |
Sen. Stace Nelson [R] | Rep. Lee Qualm [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Rep. Burt Tulson [R] |
Rep. Kathy Tyler [D] | Rep. Mike Verchio [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 738 |
2013-03-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 634 |
2013-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-27 | House | Signed by President S.J. 615 |
2013-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 9. H.J. 552 |
2013-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 535 |
2013-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 507 |
2013-02-21 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 476 |
2013-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-13 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 370 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 381 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 381 Amendment 205tc |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 364 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 322 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 205ta |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 238 |