SD SB3 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Create the Special Education Interim Legislative Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create the Special Education Interim Legislative Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 20, 2019 S.J. 732
2019-03-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 679
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 710
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the President S.J. 675
2019-03-07HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 660
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 635 Amendment 3cta
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 16. H.J. 635
2019-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 612
2019-02-27HouseEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 3. H.J. 566
2019-02-27HouseEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 3bb
2019-02-27HouseEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 3ba
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 207
2019-01-24SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 5. S.J. 171
2019-01-22SenateEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 136
2019-01-22SenateEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 3ca
2019-01-22SenateEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 3ja
2019-01-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 21

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=3&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB3P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB3SED.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB3HED.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB3H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB3ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27318&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27433&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28908&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29174&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29319&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback