SD SB30 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2020 S.J. 261
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2020 S.J. 261
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Update references to certain federal motor carrier regulations.
Title
Update references to certain federal motor carrier regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2020 S.J. 261 |
2020-02-13 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 13, 2020 S.J. 227 |
2020-02-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 275 |
2020-02-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 179 |
2020-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 227 |
2020-02-06 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-06 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 77 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 93 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 17 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate S.J. 14 |