SD SB36 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - Signed by Governor S.J. 713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - Signed by Governor S.J. 713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Protect the identity of the person or entity supplying the intravenous injection substance for executions and to increase the penalty for a violation of those provisions.
Title
Protect the identity of the person or entity supplying the intravenous injection substance for executions and to increase the penalty for a violation of those provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 713 |
2013-03-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 634 |
2013-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-26 | House | Signed by President S.J. 586 |
2013-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 8. H.J. 532 |
2013-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 507 |
2013-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 491 |
2013-02-20 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. H.J. 451 |
2013-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 158 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 159 |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 143 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 122 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 30 |