SD SB37 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 S.J. 476
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 S.J. 476
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the automatic enrollment provisions of the deferred compensation plan of the South Dakota Retirement System.
Title
Revise the automatic enrollment provisions of the deferred compensation plan of the South Dakota Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 S.J. 476 |
2018-02-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 08, 2018 S.J. 417 |
2018-02-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 382 |
2018-02-05 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 377 |
2018-02-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 319 |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-31 | House | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. H.J. 272 |
2018-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 152 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 180 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. S.J. 149 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 19 |