SD SB38 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish network adequacy standards, quality assessment and improvement requirements, utilization review and benefit determination requirements, and grievance procedures for managed health care plans, and to repeal certain standards for managed health care plans.
Title
Establish network adequacy standards, quality assessment and improvement requirements, utilization review and benefit determination requirements, and grievance procedures for managed health care plans, and to repeal certain standards for managed health care plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 40 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Signed by Governor S.J. 644 | |
2011-03-01 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 568 | |
2011-02-28 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 563 | |
2011-02-25 | Signed by President S.J. 542 | |
2011-02-24 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 29. H.J. 522 | |
2011-02-23 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 504 | |
2011-02-22 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 483 | |
2011-02-17 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 454 | |
2011-02-16 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 413 | |
2011-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 173 | |
2011-01-24 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 185 | |
2011-01-21 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 168 | |
2011-01-20 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 153 | |
2011-01-18 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 80 | |
2011-01-18 | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 38ja | |
2011-01-18 | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 38jc | |
2011-01-18 | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 38jb | |
2011-01-18 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 22 |