SD SB4 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require the Department of Labor and Regulation to determine certain job placement outcomes for graduates of all public postsecondary education institutions in the state.
Title
Require the Department of Labor and Regulation to determine certain job placement outcomes for graduates of all public postsecondary education institutions in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 756 |
2013-03-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 634 |
2013-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-27 | House | Signed by President S.J. 615 |
2013-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 6. H.J. 546 |
2013-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 535 |
2013-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 507 |
2013-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 491 |
2013-02-20 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. H.J. 449 |
2013-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 171 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 189 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 157 |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 143 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 123 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 23 |